This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2023 at 02:04:11 (UTC).

DANIEL BOHBOT VS BENCHMARK INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2023 DANIEL BOHBOT filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against BENCHMARK INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3488

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOHBOT DANIEL

Defendants

BENCHMARK INSURANCE COMPANY

INDEPENDENT GROUP AGENCY

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLOWAY STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

SPITZER GARY STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/16/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/16/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/16/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/16/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/16/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/16/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/23/2023: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Request for Dismissal

5/31/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

06/05/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Daniel Bohbot on 02/16/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Daniel Bohbot as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Daniel Bohbot (Plaintiff); As to: Benchmark Insurance Company (Defendant); Topa Insurance Company (Defendant); Independent Group Agency (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Independent Group Agency (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 57

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 57 - Hon. Michael Small; Reason: Inventory Transfer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Steven J. Kleifield in Department 57 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daniel Bohbot (Plaintiff); As to: Benchmark Insurance Company (Defendant); Topa Insurance Company (Defendant); Independent Group Agency (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daniel Bohbot (Plaintiff); As to: Benchmark Insurance Company (Defendant); Topa Insurance Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Bohbot (Plaintiff); As to: Benchmark Insurance Company (Defendant); Topa Insurance Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less