This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 12:37:05 (UTC).

DANIEL BESEDICK VS UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 DANIEL BESEDICK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1528

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BESEDICK DANIEL

Defendants

TARIN JOHN CHRISTOPHER

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHAEIAN ANI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/11/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 02/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ani Aghaeian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daniel Besedick (Plaintiff); As to: United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant); John Christopher Tarin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daniel Besedick (Plaintiff); As to: United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant); John Christopher Tarin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daniel Besedick (Plaintiff); As to: United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant); John Christopher Tarin (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAEIAN ANI