This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 02:00:11 (UTC).

DANIEL ALVA, ET AL. VS ARTHUR M. AKIMOTO, D.C., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 DANIEL ALVA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ARTHUR M AKIMOTO, D C . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0549

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVA DANIEL

ALVA CECELIA

Defendants

AKIMOTO CHIROPRACTIC OFFICE

AKIMOTO ARTHUR M. D.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONTOS JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/13/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

7/6/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 07/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 07/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Alva (Plaintiff); Cecelia Alva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Alva (Plaintiff); Cecelia Alva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Alva (Plaintiff); Cecelia Alva (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONTOS JOHN RICHARD