Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 07:41:46 (UTC).

DANIEL ALBERTO CORTEZ VS LEONARDO APARTMENTS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 DANIEL ALBERTO CORTEZ filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LEONARDO APARTMENTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTHONY MOHR and MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0691

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANTHONY MOHR

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ DANIEL ALBERTO

Defendants

LEONARDO APARTMENTS

LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

PARTIYELI JACOB OREN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/11/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

10/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/13/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/14/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • Hearing06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuation of Hearing RE: Case Management Conference); Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daniel Alberto Cortez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH AFFORDABLE HOUSING COALITION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEONARDO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O