This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 00:06:07 (UTC).

DANAE LOCATELLI, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT DORA OTRAMBO, ET AL. VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLANE, INC., A CALIFORNIA ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 DANAE LOCATELLI, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT DORA OTRAMBO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLANE, INC , A CALIFORNIA ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5265

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KOCH DEBORAH

LOCATELLI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT DORA OTRAMBO DANAE

OTRAMBO DUANE

PECKHAM DANIELLE

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLANE INC. A CALIFORNIA ENTITY

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS A CALIFORNIA ENTITY

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA ENTITY

DOE 1 LIVANOVA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH A FOREIGN COPRORATION FKA SORIN GROUP DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

DOE 2 LIVANOVA HOLDING USA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA SORIN GROUP USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEA ADAM

PANISH BRIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/20/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

12/29/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Mail

2/28/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2024
  • Hearing12/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • Hearing06/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Danae Locatelli, individually and as successor in interest to decedent Dora Otrambo (Plaintiff); Danielle Peckham (Plaintiff); Deborah Koch (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA ADAM