This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2020 at 09:42:25 (UTC).

DANA WILLIAMS VS ROBERT DOUGLAS MARTIN

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 DANA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT DOUGLAS MARTIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1946

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILLIAMS DANA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

MARTIN ROBERT DOUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHABY DAVID M. II ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHUN ARANG

CHUN ARANG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2020: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REL...) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REL...) OF 03/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REL...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND REL...)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/21/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Demand for Jury Trial

8/2/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/2/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/2/2019: Answer

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/6/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Personal Service

7/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

SUMMONS -

4/13/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/13/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dana Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (and Al Related Dates, Filed by the Defendant - MOTION GRANTED 03/18/2020) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 09:38 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and Rel...) of 03/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and Rel...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial and All Related Dates; Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Robert Douglas Martin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dana Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dana Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701946    Hearing Date: March 20, 2020    Dept: 29

Williams v. Martin

NO ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HEARD

The Court GRANTS the Motion to Continue Trial, FSC Date and Related Motion/ Discovery Dates Pursuant to the Stipulation of the Parties.

The trial is continued to October 15, 2020 at 8:30 a.m.  The final status conference is continued to October 1, 2020 at 10 a.m.

All discovery and motion cut off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.