Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 12:35:41 (UTC).

DANA VOGEL VS STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELAWARE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 DANA VOGEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELAWARE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, DEIRDRE HILL, RAMONA G. SEE, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6062

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

DEIRDRE HILL

RAMONA G. SEE

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VOGEL DANA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PROMENADE LLC

STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELAWARE INC.

ROES 1 - 10 INCLUSIVE

DOES 1 - 10 INCLUSIVE

ESCFEDERAL

Cross Defendants

ESCFEDERAL AKA FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC.

ROES 1 - 10 INCLUSIVE

ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC DOE #1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LUNDY ALBRO L III

SACCHETTO MICHAEL V

KAKISH LINA ISSA

GOBEL SEVAN

Defendant Attorneys

CERCOS THEODORE R.

CERCOS THEODORE ROSS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/13/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATE

11/13/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES, INC.S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL DISCOVERY CUT OFF DATE

Order - Dismissal

11/16/2020: Order - Dismissal

Status Report

8/27/2020: Status Report

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/2/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/19/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/22/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/4/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/27/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Association of Attorney

8/16/2019: Association of Attorney

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/2/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JESSICA ROWLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSSCOMPLAINANTS STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELA WARE, INC. AND PROMENADE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH S

7/9/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JESSICA ROWLAND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS/CROSSCOMPLAINANTS STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELA WARE, INC. AND PROMENADE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH S

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/9/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELA WARE, INC. AND PROMENADE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR MEDICAL RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF, OR,

7/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELA WARE, INC. AND PROMENADE LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS FOR MEDICAL RECORDS OF PLAINTIFF, OR,

Cross-Complaint

5/21/2019: Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/30/2019: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Complaint

11/26/2018: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/26/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to continue trial and discovery cut off date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ESCFederal (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to continue trial and discove...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketJoinder to Motion (Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Discovery Cut Off Date); Filed by Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. (Defendant); Promenade LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. (Defendant); Promenade LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Promenade LLC (Cross-Complainant); Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer (of Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. and Promenade LLC' s Answer to Pltf's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Stoltz Management of Delaware, Inc. (Defendant); Promenade LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dana Vogel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dana Vogel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dana Vogel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dana Vogel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESCFEDERAL is a litigant

Latest cases where PROMENADE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL BUILDING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STOLTZ MANAGEMENT OF DELAWARE INC. is a litigant