This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 04:52:08 (UTC).

DANA OLIVER VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 DANA OLIVER filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, ANN I. JONES and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4108

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

ANN I. JONES

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

OLIVER DANA

RASMUSSEN PAUL

CARILLO LAURA

OLIVER RORY

LORENZEN JACQUI

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRIDGFORD RICHARD KEVIN

MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV

FRANTZ JAMES P.

Defendant Attorney

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

9/13/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR

9/13/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPROMISE OF CLAIM OR ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

7/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE CLAI...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/1/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

7/1/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/21/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

7/1/2021: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE PARTICIPATING IN MSC)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE PARTICIPATING IN MSC)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR AND OVERSIGHT

5/13/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR AND OVERSIGHT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR OR OVERSIGHT

4/26/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR OR OVERSIGHT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/26/2021

4/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/26/2021

Order - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR AND OVERSIGHT

4/27/2021: Order - ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED COMPLAINT NUNC PRO TUNC DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR AND OVERSIGHT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED...)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: why the stay on discovery as to Edison Defendants should not terminate on January 18, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPetition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability [as to Riley Rasmussen] [REDACTED VERSION]; Filed by Paul Rasmussen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Paul Rasmussen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) ((REDACTED)); Filed by Paul Rasmussen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Leave to File a corrected complaint Nunc Pro Tunc due to clerical error and oversight) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketOrder (Re: Ex Parte Application For Leave To File A Corrected Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc Due To Clerical Error And Oversight); Filed by Dana Oliver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Leave to File a corrected...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docketat 2:19 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Leave to File a Corrected Complaint Nunc Pro Tunc Due to Clerical Error or Oversight); Filed by Dana Oliver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Submission of Twenty-Seventh Petition for Coordination); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 04/26/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dana Oliver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCORRECTED Complaint; Filed by Dana Oliver (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANTZ JAMES PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNICHOLAS JOHN PATRICK IV