This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 00:26:05 (UTC).

DANA MICHELLE CHAVEZ, ET AL. VS BARBARA MAHLER

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 DANA MICHELLE CHAVEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BARBARA MAHLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2722

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAVEZ DANA MICHELLE

GARZA NORBERTO CESAR

Defendant

MAHLER BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DANA MICHELLE CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); NORBERTO CESAR GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DANA MICHELLE CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); NORBERTO CESAR GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DANA MICHELLE CHAVEZ (Plaintiff); NORBERTO CESAR GARZA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O