This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2021 at 08:36:35 (UTC).

DANA ARNOLD VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 DANA ARNOLD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0005

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNOLD DANA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

A&R GRANITE AND MARBLE

RONALD AND JOANE JAVRE TRUST

Defendant and Cross Defendant

A&R GRANITE AND MARBLE

Not Classified By Court

LAHMANI NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAHMANI NICOLE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ARIAS CARL BERNARD

EKMEKCHYAN PAVEL

Cross Defendant Attorney

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/16/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Substitution of Attorney

8/10/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

6/29/2021: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/23/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

10/23/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/1/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/19/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • Hearing08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Hearing02/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Hearing01/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by A&R GRANITE AND MARBLE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A&R GRANITE AND MARBLE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff); Nicole Lahmani (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dana Arnold (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKEY ROBERT THOMAS