This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 02:23:29 (UTC).

DAN TERRELL ALEXANDER VS ERIK DE LA ROSA PEREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 DAN TERRELL ALEXANDER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ERIK DE LA ROSA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9720

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER DAN TERRELL

Defendants

PEREZ ERIK DE LA ROSA

RUANO MARIA DE LA ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKUBUILO JUDE AGOZIE

Defendant Attorney

SEEGER MARTIN LESLEY

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/11/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/10/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/23/2020: PI General Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/13/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/13/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Demand for Jury Trial

4/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Ruling

8/25/2021: Notice of Ruling

Answer

9/20/2021: Answer

Answer

9/22/2021: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • Hearing03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default / alternatively a Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Maria De La Rosa Ruano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Erik De La Rosa Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order Re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dan Terrell Alexander (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKUBUILO JUDE AGOZIE