This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 00:28:25 (UTC).

DAMIANO KIGOYE, ET AL. VS ALEX SEMWANGA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 DAMIANO KIGOYE, filed an Other lawsuit against ALEX SEMWANGA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2495

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIGOYE DAMIANO

THE UGANDAN COMMUNITY ORGANIZATION IN CALIFORRNIA

Defendants

CLAY FLORENCE SEMANDA

SENYONJO DENNIS

SEMWANGA ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/24/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/24/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

1/29/2019: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for

6/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

6/13/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

6/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

6/27/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for 1) Lack of Authorizing Signature on Complaint; 2) Failure to Attach Referenced Exhibits; 3) Lack of Required Personal Service; and 4) Failure to Appear for C.M.C.) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for 1) Lack of Authorizing...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for 1) Lack of Authorizing...) of 06/27/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 06/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Damiano Kigoye (Plaintiff); The Ugandan Community Organization In Califorrnia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Damiano Kigoye (Plaintiff); The Ugandan Community Organization In Califorrnia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Damiano Kigoye (Plaintiff); The Ugandan Community Organization In Califorrnia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less