This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 13:05:06 (UTC).

DALLY, RYAN VS DALLY, KALEE DAMICO

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 DALLY, RYAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DALLY, KALEE DAMICO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCOY, LARONDA and SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0352

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MCCOY, LARONDA

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DALLY RYAN

Claimant

CALPERS

Respondent

DALLY KALEE DAMICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KLAUSNER ANDREW RUSSELL

Respondent Attorney

HINZ WILLIAM ALFRED

 

Court Documents

Judgment

12/3/2020: Judgment

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

11/3/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

11/16/2020: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Minute Order

11/3/2020: Minute Order

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/20/2019: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

2/20/2019: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/20/2019: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/20/2019: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

RFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation

5/15/2019: RFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation

Proof of Service - Mail

5/21/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Responsive Declaration

7/16/2019: Responsive Declaration

Minute Order

7/29/2019: Minute Order

Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) - CALPERS

8/13/2019: Joinder - Summons for Joinder (Family Law) - CALPERS

Stipulation and Order - No Fee

9/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - No Fee

Minute Order

9/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

10/10/2019: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Proof of Service - Mail

10/23/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Continuance

4/15/2020: Notice - Continuance

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Off Calendar - Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Rejection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Request of Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Request of Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Child Custody and/or Visitation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CalPERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLAUSNER, ANDREW RUSSELL