This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 01:39:32 (UTC).

DALIT MESHULAM VS CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 DALIT MESHULAM filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9368

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESHULAM DALIT

Defendant

CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.

Defendant Attorney

NEBENZAHL MICHAEL R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/9/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/9/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/4/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

10/12/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631(B) AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

10/12/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631(B) AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2024
  • Hearing09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2024
  • Hearing03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2024
  • Hearing02/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Plaintiff's Deposit of Jury Fees Pursuant to CCP Section 631(b) and Demand for a Jury Trial; Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant); As to: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant); Service Date: 09/15/2022; Service Cost: 196.68; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DALIT MESHULAM (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF BEYERLY HILLS, a public entity (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/23/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF BEVERLY HILLS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZUCKERMAN PAUL S.