This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 03:48:46 (UTC).

DALEY, MAN WAI MARIE VS. DALEY, RICHARD SCOTT

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 DALEY, MAN WAI MARIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DALEY, RICHARD SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4319

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DALEY MAN WAI MARIE

Respondent

DALEY RICHARD SCOTT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai - Signed on 2017-01-25 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (SUM & PET - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai - Service Date on 2017-01-20 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-09-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • RFO/MTN - Custody, Support and Fees (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Notice (CASE ASSIGNMENT TO F46 jUDGE LOPEZ GISS - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Daley, Man Wai ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.