This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 14:49:08 (UTC).

DALE SEIDEN VS JERRY BERNSTEIN, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 DALE SEIDEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JERRY BERNSTEIN, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7857

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEIDEN DALE

Defendants

SUPERIOR EQUIPMENT SOLUTION

BERNSTEIN JEFFERY

Interested Parties

BERNSTEIN STEPHEN

STEPHEN BERNSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KINSELLA DALE F.

MELIUS AMBER HOLLEY

Defendant Attorneys

BENDER JORDAN A.

EISNER JAFFE GORRY CHAPMAN & ROSS

BENDER JORDAN ANDREW

TURKEN JAMES H.

OSBORN BLAKE LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/29/2017: Unknown

Case Management Statement

11/6/2017: Case Management Statement

Unknown

2/2/2018: Unknown

Brief

5/15/2018: Brief

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/1/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

9/4/2018: Opposition

Ex Parte Application

12/18/2018: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

12/28/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/7/2019: Unknown

Request for Judicial Notice

3/25/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

4/3/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Objection

4/3/2019: Objection

Motion in Limine

4/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Motion in Limine

4/12/2019: Motion in Limine

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by JEFFERY BERNSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • at 09:18 AM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 2:00 PM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by DALE SEIDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
236 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by DALE SEIDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by DALE SEIDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by DALE SEIDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC127857    Hearing Date: March 18, 2020    Dept: M

Counsel for Defendants Jeffrey Bernstein and Superior Equipment Solutions seek to be relieved as counsel. There is no opposition.

Legal Standard

The Court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915; People v. Prince (1968) 268 Cal.App.2d 398.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Council Form MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (CRC Rule 3.1362(a), (c), (e).) “The [proposed] order must specify all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if known. If no hearing date is presently scheduled, the court may set one and specify the date in the order. After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC Rule 3.1362(e) (emphasis added).)

The requisite forms must be served “on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC Rule 3.1362(d).) The required forms may be served “by personal service, electronic service, or mail.” (CRC Rule 3.1362(d).) In addition, “[i]f the notice is served on the client by electronic service under Code of Civil Procedure section 1010.6 and rule 2.251, it must be accompanied by a declaration stating that the electronic service address is the client's current electronic service address.” (CRC Rule 3.1362(d)(2).) Furthermore, as used in CRC Rule 3.162, “‘current’ means that the address was confirmed within 30 days before the filing of the motion to be relieved. Merely demonstrating that the notice was sent to the client's last known address and was not returned or no electronic delivery failure message was received is not, by itself, sufficient to demonstrate that the address is current. . . .’” (CRC Rule 3.1362(d).)

ANALYSIS

Attorneys James H. Turken, Blake L. Osborn, Jordan A. Bender (“Counsel”) counsel for defendants Jeffrey Bernstein and Superior Equipment Solutions seeks to be relieved as counsel. Here, Counsel have filed Judicial Council Form MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). Counsel notes that there has been an irreparable breakdown in the attorney-client relationship due to their clients conduct rendering it unreasonably difficult for them to carry out the representation effectively. (Turken Decl., MC-052, item 2.l.) Counsel for Plaintiff seeks to withdraw due to this breakdown of the attorney-client relationship. (Id.) This motion is unopposed. The Court finds good cause to relieve counsel. For these reasons, the motion is GRANTED.