This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 17:55:43 (UTC).

DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS ELLE MAE BOYKIN

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 DALBEY PROPERTIES LP , A CALIF LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against ELLE MAE BOYKIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS C. FALLS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0766

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS C. FALLS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DALBEY PROPERTIES LP. A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

BOYKIN ELLE MAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

Defendant Attorney

SPITZ ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/21/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ELLE MAE BOYKIN)

9/21/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ELLE MAE BOYKIN)

Proof of Service by Posting

10/21/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Application for Order to Post

10/6/2021: Application for Order to Post

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

11/3/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

11/3/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

11/3/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Answer

10/29/2021: Answer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • Hearing01/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Hearing12/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Thomas C. Falls, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ELLE MAE BOYKIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ELLE MAE BOYKIN)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DALBEY PROPERTIES LP., A CALIF. LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLOCK DENNIS P.