Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 20:34:58 (UTC).

DAL SOO YUN VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 DAL SOO YUN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4329

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUN DAL SOO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

GARDENA CITY OF

TIME WARNER CABLE

AT&T CORP. [DOE 1]

CITY OF GARDENA

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS CCI INC. DOE 2

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS CCI INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

AT&T CORP.

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOPPILA BRIAN WALTER

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

RIVERA JAVIER C.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

CLARK ASHLEE P.

JOFFE STEVEN J.

 

Court Documents

Summons

7/25/2019: Summons

Cross-Complaint

7/25/2019: Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal

7/31/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/31/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

3/1/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

3/1/2019: Summons

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/13/2019: Answer

Summons

5/13/2019: Summons

Answer

5/13/2019: Answer

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/16/2019: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/28/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/25/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2019: Proof of Personal Service

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

10/4/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

10/4/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Time Warner Cable Pacific West LLC Erroneously Sued As Time Warner Cable (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dal Soo Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by Time Warner Cable Pacific West LLC Erroneously Sued As Time Warner Cable (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Time Warner Cable Pacific West LLC Erroneously Sued As Time Warner Cable (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Time Warner Cable Pacific West LLC Erroneously Sued As Time Warner Cable (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer (TIME WARNER CABLE'S ANSWER TO PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY DBA AT&T'S CROSS COMPLAINT); Filed by Time Warner Cable Pacific West LLC Erroneously Sued As Time Warner Cable (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dal Soo Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dal Soo Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Dal Soo Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dal Soo Yun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant