This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 07:22:19 (UTC).

DAKOTA WINGATE VS ARAM MEGRABIAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 DAKOTA WINGATE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARAM MEGRABIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5305

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WINGATE DAKOTA

Defendants and Respondents

MEGRABIAN ANILSE

MEGRABIAN ARAM

DAVTYAN NUNE

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOSS ROBERT M.

Defendant Attorney

HURWITZ ANDRES

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

2/20/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Statement of the Case

2/21/2020: Statement of the Case

Jury Instructions

2/21/2020: Jury Instructions

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Witness List

2/5/2020: Witness List

Witness List

2/5/2020: Witness List

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE RE (1) FINDINGS OF FAULT IN TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT AS HEARSAY; AND (2) POST-ACCIDENT ATTEMP

2/5/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE RE (1) FINDINGS OF FAULT IN TRAFFIC COLLISION REPORT AS HEARSAY; AND (2) POST-ACCIDENT ATTEMP

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/20/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE

10/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE DATE

Motion to Bifurcate

12/11/2019: Motion to Bifurcate

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE; DECLARATION OF ANDRES C. HURWITZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF

1/6/2020: Reply - REPLY REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE; DECLARATION OF ANDRES C. HURWITZ IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE

1/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/11/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/19/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

5/1/2019: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS -

5/4/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/4/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate) of 02/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff); Aram Megrabian (Defendant); Anilse Megrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff); Aram Megrabian (Defendant); Anilse Megrabian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Aram Megrabian (Defendant); Anilse Megrabian (Defendant); Nune Davtyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dakota Wingate (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC705305    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 28

Defendant, Aram Megrabian, has filed a motion to bifurcate.  On February 21, 2020, the court continued the trial of this matter to March 5, 2020.  The court now continues the motion to bifurcate to that same date.  The trial court will rule on the motion. 

Case Number: BC705305    Hearing Date: January 14, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Bifurcate

Defendants Aram Megrabian and Ani Megrabyan (erroneously sued as Anilse Megrabian) (“Moving Defendants”) Motion to Bifurcate the Liability and Damages Phases at trial is CONTINUED to the trial date on February 24, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. to be heard and decided by the court assigned to conduct the trial of this action. Moving Defendants may include the motion to bifurcate and stipulation with the motions in limine in the parties’ joint trial binder, pursuant to the First Amended Standing Order Re: Final Status Conference, Personal Injury Courts, effective as of April 16, 2018, to present to the judge to whom this matter is assigned for trial.

Moving Defendants are ordered to give notice of this ruling.