This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2020 at 20:55:11 (UTC).

DAJANA MICIC VS MICHAEL SCHLAV ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 DAJANA MICIC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL SCHLAV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6322

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICIC DAJANA

Defendants

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

SMILOVICS ANDRAS

SCHLAV MICHAEL

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN JESSE LEWIS

Defendant Attorneys

ROGERS MATTHEW R.

GOLUB BETH ISAACS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY HEARINGS, VACATING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY HEARINGS, VACATING TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, AND SETTING TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT UBER'S MOTIONS)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT UBER'S MOTIONS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT UBER'S MOTIONS) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT UBER'S MOTIONS) OF 03/17/2020

Notice of Ruling

3/17/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

2/20/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 02/27/2020

2/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 02/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2020: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUSTINA L. TATE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

2/3/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JUSTINA L. TATE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED LITIGATION DATES

2/3/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED LITIGATION DATES

Motion to Continue Trial Date

2/3/2020: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/3/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTINA L. TATE

1/30/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTINA L. TATE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES;

1/30/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES;

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Plaintiff Dajana Micic's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents (Set Three) and Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Plaintiff Dajana Micic's Responses to Special Interrogatories (Set Two) and Request for Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Requests for Production of Documents (Set Two) and Request for Sanctions) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Dajana Micic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Requests for Production of Documents (Set Two) and Request for Sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Daniel M. Crowley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Plaintiff Dajana Micic's Responses to Requests for Production of Documents (Set Three) and Request for Monetary Sanctions) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dajana Micic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Dajana Micic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Dajana Micic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dajana Micic (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6322    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Continue Trial

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

Plaintiff Dajana Micic (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants Michael Schlav, Andras Smilovics, Uber Technologies, Inc., and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (“Defendants”) on December 8, 2017. This action arises from allegations of motor vehicle negligence relating to a March 13, 2017, automobile collision between Plaintiff and Defendant Michael Schlav, and allegations against Defendant Mercedes-Benz, USA relating to a defective airbag in Plaintiff’s vehicle. 

PARTYS REQUESTS

Defendant requests a continuance of the April 13, 2020, trial date to July 24, 2020.

LEGAL STANDARD

Trial dates are firm to ensure prompt disposition of civil cases. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332(a).) Continuances are thus generally disfavored. (See id. rule 3.1332(b).) Nevertheless, the trial court has discretion to continue trial dates. (Hernandez v. Superior Court (2004) 115 Cal.App.4th 1242, 1246.) Each request for continuance must be considered on its own merits and is granted upon an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332(c); Hernandez, supra, 115 Cal.App.4th at 1246.) Circumstances that may indicate good cause include: (1) the unavailability of an essential lay or expert witness due to death, illness, or other excusable circumstances; (2) the unavailability of a party due to death, illness, or other excusable circumstances; (3) the unavailability of trial counsel due to death, illness, or other excusable circumstances; (4) the substitution of trial counsel where there is an affirmative showing that the substitution is required in the interests of justice; (5) the addition of a new party if (A) the new party has not had a reasonable opportunity to conduct discovery and prepare for trial, or (B) the other parties have not had a reasonable opportunity to conduct discovery and prepare for trial in regard to the new party’s involvement in the case; (6) a party’s excused inability to obtain essential testimony, documents, or other material evidence despite diligent efforts; or (7) a significant, unanticipated change in the status of the case as a result of which the case is not ready for trial. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1332(c).)

DISCUSSION

Defendant moves for a continuance of the April 13, 2020, trial date to July 24, 2020, on the grounds that the parties to this action have stipulated to a continuance, that Plaintiff’s ongoing medical treatment requires additional discovery, that various discovery motion hearings have now been continued to March 25, 2020, and that two individual Defendants in this action have yet to be served. 

Trial in this matter was first scheduled for June 10, 2019, but was continued to December 9, 2019, by this Court upon stipulation of the parties. (Tate Decl. ¶ 4.) Thereafter, the trial date was again continued to April 13, 2020. (Id.)

Defense counsel declares that on she contacted Plaintiff’s counsel, and obtained consent to submit a Joint Stipulation in Support of Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and All Related Litigation Dates. (Id. ¶ 14.) The Court denied the ex parte relief, finding that “no good cause to bring this matter before the Court by ex parte application rather than a noticed motion.” (01/31/2020 Minute Order.) 

Defendant now argues that good cause exist to continue this motion because Defendant has been able to conduct discovery because Plaintiff delayed in providing discovery responses to Defendant. In light of the proximity between the hearings on Defendant’s motions to compel initial discovery responses, March 25, 2020, and the current April 13, 2020, trial date, the argument is well-taken. Additionally, the parties have stipulated to the continuance of trial; there is no showing that a continuance would prejudice a party to this action. 

In light of the parties’ stipulation to the continuance, the need for discovery pertaining to Plaintiff’s injuries, and the lack of prejudice to the parties to this action, Defendant’s Motion to Continue Trial is GRANTED. 

CONCLUSION

Based on the foregoing, Defendant’s Motion to Continue the April 13, 2020, trial date to July 24, 2020, is GRANTED.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERN JESSE L.