This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 10:38:35 (UTC).

DAJAIN GORDON VS LAWRENCE EDWARD MASSLY

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 DAJAIN GORDON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAWRENCE EDWARD MASSLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3847

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GORDON DAJAIN

Defendant

MASSLY LAWRENCE EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOOFER RAMIN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

PRAGER ERIKA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lawrence Edward Massly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES); Filed by Lawrence Edward Massly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dajain Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Dajain Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Dajain Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Dajain Gordon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRAGER ERIKA