This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 15:24:35 (UTC).

DAISY MARIE CORREA, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM EVELYN MARTELL VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 DAISY MARIE CORREA, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM EVELYN MARTELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY, AN OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6493

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORREA BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM EVELYN MARTELL DAISY MARIE

Defendants

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY AN OHIO CORPORATION

ROLES CHRIS

THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2024
  • Hearing09/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAISY MARIE CORREA, by and through her guardian ad litem EVELYN MARTELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAISY MARIE CORREA, by and through her guardian ad litem EVELYN MARTELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW