This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 03:20:42 (UTC).

DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ, ET AL. VS UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4692

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FELIX SANDY VANESSA

MUNOZ DAISY MARGARITA

Defendants

MONTANO CRISTOBAL JESUS

RASIER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RASIER-CA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN MICHAEL B.

Defendant Attorney

ZAMCZYK BRADLEY M

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/3/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

5/3/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/3/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/3/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/3/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

5/3/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

5/3/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/10/2022: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2025
  • Hearing04/29/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2023
  • Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CRISTOBAL JESUS MONTANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by DAISY MARGARITA MUNOZ (Plaintiff); SANDY VANESSA FELIX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAMCZYK BRADLEY M.