This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:40:29 (UTC).

DAISY GUZMAN, ET AL. VS NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 DAISY GUZMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7332

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GUZMAN JOEL ENRIQUE A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM DAISY GUZMAN

GUZMAN DANIELA NAOMI A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM DAISY GUZMAN

GUZMAN PAULA ISABEL A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM DAISY GUZMAN

GUZMAN DAISY

GUZMAN COGUOX JIMY ROSEMBEL

Defendants

NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC

SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTELBLANCO ERIC E

Defendant Attorney

POULADIAN VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/19/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT RULING

7/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT RULING

Case Management Statement

7/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

4/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling

5/4/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/29/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DANIELA

12/10/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR DANIELA

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOEL

12/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOEL

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PAULA

12/21/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PAULA

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • Hearing05/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS, LLC (Defendant); SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Court Ruling); Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Joel); Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Paula); Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Daniela); Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Daisy Guzman (Plaintiff); Jimy Rosembel Guzman Coguox (Plaintiff); Paula Isabel Guzman, a minor by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, DAISY GUZMAN (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SILVER STAR REAL ESTATE LLC. AN ALASKA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTERLBANCO ERIC E ESQ.