This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 23:28:39 (UTC).

DAIRA PENA VS MARIA GONZALEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 DAIRA PENA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3493

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

NATALI MARIA

RODRIGUEZ PALACIOS

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RODRIGUEZ PALACIOS

PALACIOS RODRIGUEZ MARIA NATALI

Defendants and Respondents

GONZALEZ LUIS

BUELNA LILLIAN

DOES 1 TO 25

GONZALEZ MARIA

Minor

PENA DAIRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y. ESQ.

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y

POURSALIMI PAYAM Y ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEZIEL COLLEEN A. ESQ.

RANDOLPH JANE ELLEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARIA NATALIA PALACI...)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MARIA NATALIA PALACI...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/20/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...) OF 11/07/2019

11/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...) OF 11/07/2019

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAYAM POURSALIMI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE

11/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAYAM POURSALIMI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Proof of Service by Mail

11/13/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; THE COURT'S ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 12/02...)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER; THE COURT'S ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 12/02...)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

8/20/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

7/3/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS]

7/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION - PLEADINGS]

Proof of Service by Mail

7/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

7/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/03/2019

7/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 07/03/2019

Notice of Deposit - Jury

2/4/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

DEFENDANTS MARIA GONZALEZ; LUIS GONZALEZ; AND LILLIAN BUELNA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/13/2018: DEFENDANTS MARIA GONZALEZ; LUIS GONZALEZ; AND LILLIAN BUELNA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

3/16/2018: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Petitioner); Daira Pena, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Matia Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise (/ Approve Compromise of Pending Action As To Minor Claimant, Daira Pena;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petitioner/Guardian Ad Litem, Maria Natalia Palaci...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Maria Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Maria Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (- Conditional Notice Filed 07/03/2019) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise (/ Approve Compromise of Pending Action As To Minor Claimant, Daira Pena;) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 4:06 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; The Court's order Re: Continuance of the 12/02...) of 11/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Daira Pena, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Matia Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Petitioner); Daira Pena, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Matia Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Maria Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Petitioner); Daira Pena, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Matia Natali Palacios Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693493    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 2

Pena v. Gonzalez

Having reviewed the Petitioner’s Expedited Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise filed on 8/20/19, the court finds that the settlement is reasonable and GRANTS the petition. However, the court reduces costs by $645.

Counsel for Plaintiff, Payam Y. Poursalimi, waives the $645 fee and submits to the court’s 11/7/19 Order. (Poursalimi Decl., ¶¶ 5-6.) He requests that the court vacate the hearing date and approve the minor’s compromise based upon the court’s order reducing costs by $645. (Id. at ¶ 7.)

Petitioner is ordered to provide proposed orders approving the petition and order deposit of the net settlement funds.

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE COMPLIANCE on April 20, 2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance is required if the depository’s acknowledgement of receipt of the order and the funds is filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC693493    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: 2

On the court’s own motion, the hearing on the Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise/Approve Compromise set for hearing on 12/2/19 is continued to 12/20/19 at 1:30 p.m. in Department SS-2.