This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 05:46:38 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST VS WILLIAM RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 DAIMLER TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0967

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIMLER TRUST

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/21/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/21/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/21/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/30/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Daimler Trust (Plaintiff); As to: William Rodriguez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 86.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen Morgan in Department A14 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Daimler Trust (Plaintiff); As to: William Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Daimler Trust (Plaintiff); As to: William Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Daimler Trust (Plaintiff); As to: William Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS VANESSA