This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 15:43:54 (UTC).

DAIMLER TRUST VS SHAHIN IGHANI

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 DAIMLER TRUST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHAHIN IGHANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0777

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAIMLER TRUST

Defendant

IGHANI SHAHIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: DAIMLER TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHIN IGHANI (Defendant); Service Date: 09/25/2022; Service Cost: 86.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DAIMLER TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHIN IGHANI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DAIMLER TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHIN IGHANI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DAIMLER TRUST (Plaintiff); As to: SHAHIN IGHANI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS VANESSA