This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 07:59:52 (UTC).

DAHESH, BEHNAM VS NAZAR, MANDANA AMIN

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 DAHESH, BEHNAM filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against NAZAR, MANDANA AMIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STREIMER, LAURA and AMERIAN, MICHAEL R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0696

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STREIMER, LAURA

AMERIAN, MICHAEL R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAHESH BEHNAM

Respondent

NAZAR MANDANA AMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KADE MICHAEL PAYMAN

Respondent Attorney

ROSHAN-ZAMIR PERRY

 

Court Documents

Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

3/6/2023: Notice - Ruling - Notice - Ruling (Notices)

Minute Order

2/15/2023: Minute Order

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/20/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Minute Order

1/31/2023: Minute Order

Reply - Reply

1/24/2023: Reply - Reply

Opposition - PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE RETRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING OF JUNE 2, 2022; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. KADE, AND BENHAM

1/17/2023: Opposition - PETITIONER'S OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE RETRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING OF JUNE 2, 2022; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES DECLARATION OF MICHAEL P. KADE, AND BENHAM

Declaration - Declaration of Ryan Lapine in Support of Motion to Set Aside

12/2/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Ryan Lapine in Support of Motion to Set Aside

RFO/MTN - Set Aside - Motion to Set Aside Order of June 2, 2022

12/2/2022: RFO/MTN - Set Aside - Motion to Set Aside Order of June 2, 2022

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/2/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

6/2/2022: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

6/2/2022: Minute Order

Response - Domestic Violence - Response - Domestic Violence

6/1/2022: Response - Domestic Violence - Response - Domestic Violence

Declaration - Declaration of Mandana Nazar

6/1/2022: Declaration - Declaration of Mandana Nazar

Minute Order

5/11/2022: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - SUB IN

5/11/2022: Substitution of Attorney - SUB IN

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/11/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

5/11/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

5/5/2022: Proof of Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (Notice - Ruling (Notices) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; RFO - Set Aside - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department D, Streimer, Laura, Presiding; RFO - Set Aside - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Under Submission for Decision; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketReply (Reply ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (SUB IN ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less