This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 18:28:47 (UTC).

D&A INTERNATIONAL INVESTMENTS, LLC VS SOUTHLAND ROOFING, INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 D A INTERNATIONAL INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTHLAND ROOFING, INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2132

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

D&A INTERNATIONAL INVESTMENTS LLC

SOUTHLAND ROOFING INCORPORATED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY A WISCONSIN CORPORATION

PRENGA PIER PJERIN

SOUTHLAND ROOFING INCORPORATED A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY

SOUTHLAND ROOFING INCORPORATED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LEWIN RODNEY T.

LEWIN RODNEY T

Defendant Attorneys

MOOSHEKH ALAN

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/8/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

General Denial

2/15/2022: General Denial

Cross-Complaint

2/15/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

2/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Case

3/10/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/11/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

4/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILUR...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

4/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Complaint

1/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to defendant Pier Pjerin Prenga) - Held - Advanced and Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Failur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Southland Roofing, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Old Republic Surety Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by D&A International Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHLAND ROOFING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOOSHEKH ALAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E