This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 20:21:49 (UTC).

D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS SAMO 1, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 D A CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAMO 1, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0775

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

D.A. CONSTRUCTION INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

SAMO 1 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL ETHAN O.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HARTNEY MARK S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/27/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

7/20/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/20/2021: Cross-Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAMO 1, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SAMO 1, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D.A. CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ETHAN OHAD