This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2023 at 11:49:03 (UTC).

D. G., ET AL. VS DOE 1, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2022 D G , filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT, JILL FEENEY and MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0643

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

JILL FEENEY

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

G. D.

L. L.

Defendants

DOE 1

DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONAHOO WILLIAM E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TREPANIER LISA DEARDEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

10/9/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy /Settlement; Case Management...)

10/5/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy /Settlement; Case Management...)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration DECLARATION TO SHOW CAUSE RE BANKRUPTCY

9/20/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration DECLARATION TO SHOW CAUSE RE BANKRUPTCY

Case Management Statement

9/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice (name extension) Notice NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

9/20/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case Notice of Related Case NOTE: DEPT 6 HAS THE EARLIER FILED CASE

8/28/2023: Notice of Related Case Notice of Related Case NOTE: DEPT 6 HAS THE EARLIER FILED CASE

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

8/18/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

Notice of Ruling

5/31/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

5/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

5/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Order (name extension) Order ON PLAINTIFFS’ APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL ALL CERTIFICATES OF MERIT

1/31/2023: Order (name extension) Order ON PLAINTIFFS’ APPLICATION FOR IN CAMERA FINDING OF REASONABLE AND MERITORIOUS CAUSE FOR FILING OF ACTION AND ORDER TO SEAL AND KEEP CONFIDENTIAL ALL CERTIFICATES OF MERIT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;) of 01/27/2023

1/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;) of 01/27/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;)

1/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Case Referred to Department 1 for Review an...) of 01/26/2023

1/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Case Referred to Department 1 for Review an...) of 01/26/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Case Referred to Department 1 for Review an...)

1/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Case Referred to Department 1 for Review an...)

Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging CERTIFICATES OF MERIT IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT AGAINST DOE 1 AND DOE 2 CONFIDENTIALLY FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 340.1

1/25/2023: Notice of Lodging (name extension) Notice of Lodging CERTIFICATES OF MERIT IN SUPPORT OF COMPLAINT AGAINST DOE 1 AND DOE 2 CONFIDENTIALLY FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW PURSUANT TO C.C.P. SECTION 340.1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/26/2024

Hearing12/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2024

Hearing05/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: D. G. (Plaintiff); L. L. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketStatus Conference re: Bankruptcy Stay and/or Coordination (Department 6, Spring Street) scheduled for 05/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy /Settlement; Case Management...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy /Settlement scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 updated: Result Date to 10/05/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketDeclaration DECLARATION TO SHOW CAUSE RE BANKRUPTCY; Filed by: D. G. (Plaintiff); L. L. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
12/29/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: D. G. (Plaintiff); L. L. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); DOE 2, a religious corporation sole (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: D. G. (Plaintiff); L. L. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); DOE 2, a religious corporation sole (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: D. G. (Plaintiff); L. L. (Plaintiff); As to: DOE 1, a California nonprofit corporation (Defendant); DOE 2, a religious corporation sole (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less