This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/22/2022 at 03:49:33 (UTC).

D &D BUILDING SOLUTIONS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS AMW CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 D D BUILDING SOLUTIONS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMW CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5912

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D &D BUILDING SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

WHITSON LA TAUN

AMW CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WHITSON ANTHONY M. JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAWFORD DANIEL A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE: CASE STATUS

5/6/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE: CASE STATUS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

2/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

2/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

11/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

5/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

Case Management Statement

5/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

2/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE SERVICE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Status Conference (Re Service) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Service;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE: CASE STATUS); Filed by D &D Building Solutions, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Status Conference (Re Service) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Service;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ROZA CRAWFORD RE NON-SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS); Filed by D &D Building Solutions, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Status Conference (Re Service) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re Service;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D &D Building Solutions, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D &D Building Solutions, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by D &D Building Solutions, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD DANIEL A