This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 12:52:05 (UTC).

D. C., BY AND THROUGH HIM GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ET AL. VS WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 D C , BY AND THROUGH HIM GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2402

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

C OLIVIA

Defendants

RAMIREZ JORGE

CORK-ANTHONY YOLANDA

CANYON VIEW SCHOOL

MANN JOHN

EAST SAN GABRIEL SPECIAL EDUCATION LOCAL PLANNING AREA

MCKINLEY CHILDREN?S CENTER INC.

ORTIZ JEANNIE

CASATO DIANA MARIE

MILLER JENNIFER

WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

RAMEY CHRISTA HAGGAI

Defendant Attorneys

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

HYLTON COURTNEY

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/12/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER

Request for Dismissal

12/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/28/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Demand for Jury Trial

8/31/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/31/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

7/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/28/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Request for Judicial Notice

6/28/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/28/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/28/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

6/28/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/28/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN FILED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2024
  • Hearing01/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Hearing07/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order ([PROPOSED] STIPULATION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER); Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by McKINLEY CHILDREN?S CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by McKINLEY CHILDREN?S CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by McKINLEY CHILDREN?S CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for D.C.); Filed by Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by D. C., by and through him guardian ad litem (Plaintiff); Olivia C (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCKINLEY CHILDRENS CENTER A NON-PROFIT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where WEST COVINA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where CANYON VIEW LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HYLTON COURTNEY L