Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2021 at 07:45:00 (UTC).

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY VS ANTHONY WRIGHT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANTHONY WRIGHT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

L.A. CHECKER CAB COMPANY INC.

WRIGHT ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOECK MICHAEL DAVID

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/4/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cypress Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.A. CHECKER CAB COOPERATIVE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D