This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:22:56 (UTC).

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES VS SAMUEL DUKE DELGADO

Case Summary

On 09/24/2021 CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAMUEL DUKE DELGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5303

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES

Defendant

DELGADO SAMUEL DUKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

9/24/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/24/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2024
  • Hearing09/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY DANIEL B.