This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 17:19:02 (UTC).

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES VS LESA MARIE GREENFIELD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LESA MARIE GREENFIELD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4476

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY AS ADMINISTERED BY BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES

Defendants

GREENFIELD LESA MARIE

RIVERA GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY DANIEL B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Lis Pendens

9/21/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2024
  • Hearing09/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Hearing03/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cypress Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Companies (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant