This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 18:49:29 (UTC).

CYNTHIA ZEPEDA, ET AL. VS BARBARA BRUNNER

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 CYNTHIA ZEPEDA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BARBARA BRUNNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2077

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ZEPEDA CYNTHIA

ZEPEDA IRMA

Defendant

BRUNNER BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAZARIAN JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

ARAUJO CHANEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

4/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

4/11/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/11/2022: Answer

Association of Attorney

11/10/2022: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/14/2022: Substitution of Attorney

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2025
  • Hearing04/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Barbara Brunner (Defendant); As to: Cynthia Zepeda (Plaintiff); Irma Zepeda (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cynthia Zepeda (Plaintiff); Irma Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cynthia Zepeda (Plaintiff); Irma Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cynthia Zepeda (Plaintiff); Irma Zepeda (Plaintiff); As to: Barbara Brunner (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less