This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 15:48:03 (UTC).

CYNTHIA WILSON, ET AL. VS ERIN DEARTH, R.N., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 CYNTHIA WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ERIN DEARTH, R N . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0819

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON CYNTHIA

WILSON JAMES

Defendants

DEARTH ERIN R.N.

PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON JENNIFER

Defendant Attorney

BUCHHOLZ SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

2/3/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/27/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

12/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Demand for Jury Trial

12/21/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/21/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/21/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal

12/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

12/3/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

12/3/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2024
  • Hearing10/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (Proof of Electronic Service); Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lancaster Hospital Corporation dba Palmdale Regional Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Counsel); Filed by Lancaster Hospital Corporation dba Palmdale Regional Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Lancaster Hospital Corporation dba Palmdale Regional Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Lancaster Hospital Corporation dba Palmdale Regional Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Erin Dearth Levin, R.N. Erroneously Sued As Erin Dearth, R.N. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Erin Dearth Levin, R.N. Erroneously Sued As Erin Dearth, R.N. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cynthia Wilson (Plaintiff); James Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES OF PALMDALE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant