This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2023 at 06:17:06 (UTC).

CYNTHIA WILLIAMS VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 CYNTHIA WILLIAMS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1543

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS CYNTHIA

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINER SHELBY L.

Defendant Attorney

FERGUSON NOHEMI GUTIERREZ

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/21/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/6/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/31/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/30/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Judicial Notice

5/25/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/25/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/25/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHELBY MINER ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/25/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHELBY MINER ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHRYN VANIER ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

5/25/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATHRYN VANIER ISO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

5/12/2023: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Answer

5/11/2023: Answer

Notice of Ruling

5/11/2023: Notice of Ruling

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/27/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/24/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAddress for Shelby L. Miner (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cynthia Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cynthia Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cynthia Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Malcolm Mackey in Department 55 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less