This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 22:00:38 (UTC).

CYNTHIA ROMANO VS BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 CYNTHIA ROMANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9725

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMANO CYNTHIA

Defendants

BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BOSTON SCIENTIFIC NEUROMODULATION CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNEPPER DAWN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/23/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

11/23/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

10/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Cynthia Romano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cynthia Romano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cynthia Romano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cynthia Romano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOSTON SCIENTIFIC NEUROMODULATION CORPOR- is a litigant

Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant