This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/25/2021 at 05:11:29 (UTC).

CYNTHIA ROBINSON VS INGLEWOOD MORTUARY

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 CYNTHIA ROBINSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INGLEWOOD MORTUARY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7157

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBINSON CYNTHIA

Defendants and Respondents

INGLEWOOD MORTUARY

DOES 1 TO 25

MORTUARY IGLEWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PEACOR HENRY ANDREWS

KASHRI RONNIE

KASHRI RONNIE ESQ.

LEINBACH BRIAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NELMS ROBERT WILLIAM

NELMS ROBERT W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/4/2021: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

7/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER COURT ORDER - SETTING A TRIAL SETTING CON...) OF 08/04/2020

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER COURT ORDER - SETTING A TRIAL SETTING CON...) OF 08/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER COURT ORDER - SETTING A TRIAL SETTING CON...)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER COURT ORDER - SETTING A TRIAL SETTING CON...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/28/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel - DEFENDANT INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION,

2/20/2020: Motion to Compel - DEFENDANT INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION,

Response - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATION AND CLARIFYING 11-21-19 MINUTE ORDER

2/28/2020: Response - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL MENTAL EXAMINATION AND CLARIFYING 11-21-19 MINUTE ORDER

Reply - INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION, FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE C

3/6/2020: Reply - INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION, FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE C

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. INGLEWOOD MORTUARYS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING COMPLI...)

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. INGLEWOOD MORTUARYS MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING COMPLI...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE

1/10/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

1/9/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Motion to Compel - INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION

1/9/2020: Motion to Compel - INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A MENTAL EXAMINATION

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cynthia Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cynthia Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT INGLEWOOD MORTUARY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Unverified Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cynthia Robinson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES (1) BREACH OF ORAL CONTRACT ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7157    Hearing Date: March 13, 2020    Dept: M

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT – SOUTHWEST DISTRICT

Honorable Dudley W. Gray II Friday, March 13, 2020

Department M Calendar No.

PROCEEDINGS

Cynthia Robinson v. Inglewood Mortuary, et al.

****7157

1. Inglewood Mortuary’s Motion for an Order Compelling Compliance with the Court’s Order Regarding the Mental Examination of Cynthia Robinson

TENTATIVE RULING

Inglewood Mortuary’s Motion for an Order Compelling Compliance with the Court’s Order Regarding the Mental Examination of Cynthia Robinson is granted, in part.

On November 15, 2019, Defendant moved for an order requiring Plaintiff Cynthia Robinson to submit to a mental examination pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 2032.310, et seq. The Court took the motion under submission. On November 21, 2019, the Court granted the motion. However, the Court’s ruling has now caused confusion as to the length of the examination. A review of the Court’s ruling reveals areas in which it is reasonable that the parties may be confused regarding the length of the examination.

Thus, the request for clarification of the Court’s order and the request to compel Plaintiff to appear for examination subject to this clarification is granted. However, both parties’ respective requests for monetary sanctions are denied as both parties acted with substantial justification for their actions in light of the confusion caused by the Court’s order.

The Court stated: “Based upon the foregoing analysis and arguments at the hearing the Court finds good cause exists to require Plaintiff to submit to a mental examination for four hours[.]” The time frame of four hours was the ultimate decision of this Court after having taken the matter under submission. The Court determined that four hours was a reasonable length of time for the examination.

Thus, Plaintiff is ordered to appear for her mental examination, at a date and time to be determined by mutual agreement of the parties, under all terms and conditions as previously delineated in the Court’s prior order of November 21, 2019, with the clarification that the total length of the examination shall be four hours, not inclusive of time allotted for breaks e.g., if a fifteen-minute break is taken, then the total time that Plaintiff may be required to be present on the date of examination is 4 hours and 15 minutes.

Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD MORTUARY is a litigant