This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 06:51:42 (UTC).

CYNTHIA PREISS ET AL VS AT & T SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 CYNTHIA PREISS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AT T SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6894

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PREISS CYNTHIA

PREISS JANET

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

AT & T SERVICES INC.

VALLE JUAN

RICARDO MICHEL DOE 41

SOSA ALBERT

SMITH KEISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GEBLER GARY L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

KADOMATSU KARI D.

FRANK JASON M.

NISHIMURA GILBERT M. ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 12; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 12; (Motion to Compel; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order (Court Order; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff); Janet Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 12; Ruling on Submitted Matter (Ruling on Submitted Matter; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff); Janet Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff); Janet Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff); Janet Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Cynthia Preiss (Plaintiff); Janet Preiss (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. WILLFUL MISCONDUCT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT AND T SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANK JASON M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KADOMATSU KARI C