This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 19:54:10 (UTC).

CYNTHIA MORALES VS U.S. METRO GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 CYNTHIA MORALES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against U S METRO GROUP, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1359

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES CYNTHIA

Defendants

LEE BRIAN

KIM EVELYN

U.S. METRO GROUP INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

INAMINE BRIAN SEISHIN

Other Attorneys

MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/29/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAIN...)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAINST JUDGE MALCOLM MACKEY

2/10/2021: Order - ORDER COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGAINST JUDGE MALCOLM MACKEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • Hearing10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL; Filed by U.S. Metro Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Evelyn Kim (Defendant); Brian Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by U.S. Metro Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Evelyn Kim (Defendant); Brian Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by U.S. Metro Group, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Evelyn Kim (Defendant); Brian Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cynthia Morales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US METRO GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAGANTE EDZYL JOSEF GONZALES