This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 17:17:29 (UTC).

CYNTHIA KNOX VS JEFFREY STEPHENS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 CYNTHIA KNOX filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY STEPHENS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3295

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNOX CYNTHIA

Defendant

STEPHENS JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MAHLSTEDT JOY L.

Other Attorneys

HALL COREY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

6/1/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

5/28/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

5/28/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Jeffrey Stephens (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jeffrey Stephens (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jeffrey Stephens (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cynthia Knox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cynthia Knox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cynthia Knox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cynthia Knox (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL COREY A.