This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 05:42:28 (UTC).

CYNTHIA CERVERA VS FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 CYNTHIA CERVERA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0588

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERVERA CYNTHIA

Defendant

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

INGBER JASON

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

1/11/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

1/11/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL

1/30/2023: Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL

Answer

2/8/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2025
  • Hearing01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2024
  • Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2024
  • Hearing06/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice Designation of Counsel; Filed by: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/17/2023; Service Cost: 195.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cynthia Cervera (Plaintiff); As to: FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less