This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 21:38:10 (UTC).

CUTTINO MOBLEY, ET AL. VS FAY SERVICING, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 CUTTINO MOBLEY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FAY SERVICING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0537

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOBLEY CUTTINO

NP HOMES LLC

Defendants

FAY SERVICING

TROTTER HERB

COMMERCIAL DEFAULT SERVICES LLC

CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES

1 THROUGH 10 DOES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY SUSAN MEDAGLIA

Defendant Attorneys

CIRLIN JASON NADAV

SOONG ELAINE

YANG ELAINE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 09/07/2021, COPY OF SIGNED ORDERS

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL) OF 09/07/2021, COPY OF SIGNED ORDERS

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/7/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

9/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/7/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/7/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Request for Judicial Notice

8/26/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELAINE SOONG

8/26/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELAINE SOONG

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/26/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

7/2/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Declaration - DECLARATION COMMERCIAL DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

7/7/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION COMMERCIAL DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC'S DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT COMMERCIAL DEAULT SERVICES, LLC

7/16/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF NONMONETARY STATUS OF DEFENDANT COMMERCIAL DEAULT SERVICES, LLC

Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

7/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELAINE SOONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FAY SERVICING, LLCS AND CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELAINE SOONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS FAY SERVICING, LLCS AND CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLCS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Susan Medaglia Murphy (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 09/07/2021, Copy of Signed Orders); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Susan Medaglia Murphy (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by Fay Servicing (Defendant); Civic Financial Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff); NP Homes LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff); NP Homes LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff); NP Homes LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff); NP Homes LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Cuttino Mobley (Plaintiff); NP Homes LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMERCIAL DEFAULT SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CIVIC FINANCIAL SERVICES A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Fay Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CIRLIN JASON N