This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2023 at 13:43:48 (UTC).

CURTIS TYLER RYKEN VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 CURTIS TYLER RYKEN filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0557

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RYKEN CURTIS TYLER

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CRANDALL SEAN

WOOD CAREY B.

Defendant Attorney

DAO VANESSA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/27/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/27/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/28/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/8/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/3/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Curtis Tyler Ryken (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Curtis Tyler Ryken (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 03/02/2023; Service Cost: 31.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Curtis Tyler Ryken (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Curtis Tyler Ryken (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Curtis Tyler Ryken (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less