This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 04:46:43 (UTC).

CURT MIHALIC VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, PUBLIC WORKS

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 CURT MIHALIC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, PUBLIC WORKS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1252

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIHALIC CURT

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES PUBLIC WORKS

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMELI CHANTELLE

Defendant Attorney

GUTERRES TOMAS ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

6/21/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/14/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/10/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/30/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

10/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2024
  • Hearing06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by County of Los Angeles, Public Works (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles, Public Works (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Curt Mihalic (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMELI CHANTELLE S.