This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 18:38:34 (UTC).

CURRY-LEVY, BRODI - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 CURRY-LEVY, BRODI - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8914

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEVY BRIAN

Not Classified By Court

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN

 

Court Documents

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

10/27/2020: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

11/12/2020: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Minute Order

3/24/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - Proof of Funding of Annuity Pursuant to Court Order Approving Compromise; Declaration of Kelley J. Lazarovits in Support Thereof

2/17/2021: Declaration - Proof of Funding of Annuity Pursuant to Court Order Approving Compromise; Declaration of Kelley J. Lazarovits in Support Thereof

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Proof of Funding of Annuity Pursuant to Court Order Approving Compromise; Declaration of Kelley J. Lazarovits in Support Thereof ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDISP: Expedited Minor's Compromise Approved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAROVITS KELLEY JEAN