This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 22:17:34 (UTC).

CTBC BANK CORP. (USA), A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JAMES C MIN

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 CTBC BANK CORP USA , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAMES C MIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0448

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CTBC BANK CORP. USA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CTBC BANK CORP. USA

Defendant

MIN JAMES C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUTZKUS MARK D.

BRUTZKUS MARK D. ESQ.

BRUTZKUS MARK D. ESQ..

Defendant Attorney

KIM PIO SUK

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY

9/3/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY

Notice of Ruling

9/3/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGM...)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGM...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

8/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY

8/31/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY

Notice of Related Case

8/20/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF INITIAL APPEARANCE FEE AND CONSENT TO JURISDICTION FOR PURPOSES OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

8/20/2020: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF INITIAL APPEARANCE FEE AND CONSENT TO JURISDICTION FOR PURPOSES OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGM...)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGM...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

8/18/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

8/18/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/17/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/18/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/11/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of Stipulated Judgm...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketJudgment (JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY); Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON PERSONAL GUARANTY); Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appearance (DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF INITIAL APPEARANCE FEE AND CONSENT TO JURISDICTION FOR PURPOSES OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT); Filed by James C Min (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Entry of Stipulated Judgm...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT); Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CTBC BANK CORP. (USA) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHINATRUST BANK (USA) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUTZKUS MARK D.